Trustees THE NATIONWIDE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1065552

Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saphie Ashtiany | Chair | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Sinclair | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Beazley | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Collins | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Baroness Usha Prashar | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gill Leng | Trustee | 15 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
TERRIE ALAFAT | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Judith McNeill | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Antonia Bance | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mitchell | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.