AWAZ UTAOH LIMITED

Charity number: 1068512
Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 44 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 44 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 05 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 05 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 19 May 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 19 May 2019 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 February 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 February 2017 26 days late Download