AWAZ UTAOH LIMITED

Charity number: 1068512
Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £93.76k £84.86k £82.74k £53.26k £28.37k
Total expenditure £103.18k £90.11k £85.65k £74.50k £28.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £30.00k £30.00k £7.50k N/A