Accounts and annual returns PAMODZI

Charity number: 1074415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required