Financial history PAMODZI

Charity number: 1074415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.84k £31.87k £22.80k £8.40k £400
Total expenditure £16.00k £23.91k £24.01k £8.32k £7.41k
Income from government contracts N/A £31.87k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A