Accounts and annual returns KING'S LYNN FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1066819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 July 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 July 2020 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 26 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window