Financial history KING'S LYNN FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1066819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £263.14k £267.25k £289.57k £93.91k £23.77k
Total expenditure £258.83k £278.55k £306.06k £104.82k £40.55k
Income from government contracts £35.66k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £35.66k £17.27k £44.54k £23.07k