WORKSOP MINERS WELFARE BAND

Charity number: 1069527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.89k £3.89k £4.19k £3.24k £3.36k
Total expenditure £2.00k £815 £808 £1.12k £1.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A