Financial history THE COUNTESS OF BRECKNOCK HOSPICE TRUST

Charity number: 1067238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £988.19k £1.09m £657.86k £694.47k £609.17k
Total expenditure £567.48k £1.08m £3.51m £695.45k £522.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £25.00k N/A £2.94k
Income - Donations and legacies £905.98k £1.04m £661.47k £642.50k £555.30k
Income - Other trading activities £5.02k £5.15k £8.17k £10.00k £11.05k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £77.20k £47.52k £38.74k £38.42k £39.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £3.55k £2.94k
Income - Legacies £20.44k £323.91k £117.02k £124.09k £155.35k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £511.14k £1.01m £3.43m £636.75k £445.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.34k £70.32k £81.67k £58.70k £76.48k
Expenditure - Governance £57.56k £0 £4.44k £4.50k £4.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £433.98k £938.48k £3.33m £513.72k £310.01k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £4.77k £6.20k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0