Trustees THE COUNTESS OF BRECKNOCK HOSPICE TRUST

Charity number: 1067238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLARE SCHECKTER Chair 08 March 2016
None on record
Robert Childs Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Mark Hyson FCA Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Vice Admiral Robin Paul Boissier CB Trustee 29 October 2019
None on record
Emma Katrina Sandy Trustee 25 October 2018
None on record
BRUCE RODNEY WINGATE PARKER MBE Trustee 02 November 2017
WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE ELIZABETH COLLEGE UK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FYFIELD OLD NATIONAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF WINCHESTER CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
PATRICIA ANNE KINNERSLEY WEST Trustee 24 November 2011
None on record
REAR ADMIRAL IAIN ROBERT HENDERSON CB CBE DL Trustee
SURPLUS FUND OF THE ROYAL NAVY CLUB
Received: On time