Financial history BETHEL TEMPLE OF CHRIST

Charity number: 1076102
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022
Total gross income £31.83k £31.83k £30.86k £30.86k £27.77k
Total expenditure £17.88k £28.06k £30.49k £30.49k £24.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A