ACTION FOR BRAZIL'S CHILDREN TRUST

Charity number: 1069022
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 313 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 313 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 679 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 679 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1044 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1044 days
Annual return 31 August 2016 04 September 2017 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 04 September 2017 66 days late
Annual return 31 August 2015 12 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 12 June 2016 On time