Financial history BRISTOL ISLAMIC SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity number: 1070273
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.05m £2.52m £901.52k £719.69k £823.96k
Total expenditure £1.10m £2.15m £851.04k £747.80k £887.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £56.95k
Income from government grants £46.06k £43.93k £67.04k £80.48k £56.95k
Income - Donations and legacies £175.92k £256.24k £283.24k £154.74k £186.37k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £18.94k
Income - Charitable activities £826.11k £648.17k £593.14k £464.05k £618.65k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £48.03k £1.62m £25.14k £100.90k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £186.37k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £2.15m £851.04k £747.80k £887.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £105.52k £1.25m £21.46k £23.42k £53.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0