CAREW MEMORIAL HALL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1069242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £3.63k £3.87k £3.49k £3.07k £2.10k
Total expenditure £2.49k £2.79k £2.58k £2.74k £1.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A