COMPASS SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED

Charity number: 1068324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.15m £861.00k £1.72m £1.59m £1.16m
Total expenditure £1.02m £825.00k £1.79m £1.64m £1.19m
Income from government contracts £133.78k £54.81k £665.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £49.79k £10.00k £39.81k £504.14k £134.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.14m £859.00k £1.72m £1.59m £1.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £2.00k £1.00k £1.00k £2.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m £825.00k £1.79m £1.64m £1.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k £1.00k £2.00k £2.00k £1.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0