THE DHARMAJ SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 1070401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 15/08/2016 15/08/2017 15/08/2018 15/08/2019 15/08/2020
Total gross income £153.45k £74.79k £48.56k £48.56k £87.51k
Total expenditure £62.56k £39.40k £34.33k £34.33k £38.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A