ST RICHARDS HALL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1068465
Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 483 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 483 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 849 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 849 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1214 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1214 days
Annual return 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1579 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1579 days