ST RICHARDS HALL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1068465
Charity reporting is overdue by 1541 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £29.22k £33.19k £42.71k £44.72k £52.97k
Total expenditure £27.01k £31.48k £37.35k £42.32k £47.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £43.89k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0