Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAEL'S CATHOLIC SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1069394
Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 483 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 483 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 848 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 848 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1214 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1214 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required