FOREST FIELDS WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1072167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £42.59k £29.89k £5.66k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £37.45k £15.42k £4.70k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A