ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION CHESTER BRANCH

Charity number: 1068802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required