ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION CHESTER BRANCH

Charity number: 1068802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.39k £1.79k £1.79k £1.54k £720
Total expenditure £1.42k £1.60k £1.60k £1.38k £625
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A