Financial history URBAN PARTNERSHIP GROUP

Charity number: 1092258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.18m £1.41m £1.69m £1.92m £1.86m
Total expenditure £1.13m £1.38m £1.66m £1.89m £2.03m
Income from government contracts £603.75k £842.96k £1.15m £1.20m £868.50k
Income from government grants £143.00k £133.10k £133.10k £133.20k £305.15k
Income - Donations and legacies £328.68k £277.15k £191.23k £242.13k £356.38k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £849.08k £1.13m £1.49m £1.68m £1.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.30k £6.06k £2.17k £2.38k £473
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £1.31m £1.57m £1.81m £1.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.44k £44.04k £50.35k £82.49k £101.63k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £8.50k £0 £46.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £8.06k £32.54k £36.94k £0 £0