YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE, BRIXHAM, LTD.

Charity number: 1072028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £192.27k £631.97k £224.61k £330.09k £280.05k
Total expenditure £225.59k £219.44k £180.06k £215.36k £372.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £95.71k £541.91k N/A £684 £89.83k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £541.91k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £49.85k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £40.41k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A -£196 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £108.93k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £110.12k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £396 N/A N/A N/A