YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE, BRIXHAM, LTD.

Charity number: 1072028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrea Margarete Stemmer Trustee 13 February 2016 None on record
Liz McCusker Trustee 01 November 2013 None on record
MARK NICHOLAS HARROD Chair 14 January 2014 None on record
Bryony Stevens Trustee 26 February 2020 None on record
Alan Tilly Trustee 22 May 2021 None on record
Richard Snell Trustee 14 September 2019 None on record