Trustees HER CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1070755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Lade Hephzibah Olugbemi Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Tosin Adewumi Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Cassie Taylor Trustee 15 February 2022
None on record
Megan Webster Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Claire Wheeler Trustee 10 October 2018
SAFER GREENWICH
Overdue by 74 days
Kathleen Tutton Chair Trustee 08 January 2018
None on record
Lisa Walsh Trustee 14 December 2016
None on record
Victoria Creed Trustee 02 June 2015
None on record