STEPPING STONES COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1069962
Charity reporting is overdue by 716 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £66.18k £79.29k £72.05k £83.44k £90.48k
Total expenditure £66.27k £75.66k £68.52k £83.13k £87.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £45.26k £58.31k £65.47k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0