Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAEL'S C.E. (C) PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND (LICHFIELD)

Charity number: 1069868
Charity reporting is overdue by 259 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 259 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 259 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required