Financial history Stella Maris

Charity number: 1069833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.61m £1.70m £1.64m £1.76m £2.13m
Total expenditure £1.62m £1.71m £1.79m £2.04m £2.58m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.52m £1.56m £1.49m £1.65m £2.02m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £96.99k £136.25k £135.82k £108.66k £109.07k
Income - Other £195 £292 £8.18k £143 £0
Income - Legacies £117.77k £256.13k £100.00k £544.17k £134.05k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.23m £1.28m £1.61m £2.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £416.28k £475.14k £503.05k £424.29k £529.73k
Expenditure - Governance £26.32k £8.81k £29.08k £31.85k £21.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £27.69k £40.99k £10.38k £94.70k £517.35k
Expenditure - Investment management £32.50k £34.96k £34.87k £33.34k £34.41k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0