BRITISH EX-SERVICES WHEELCHAIR SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1071226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £77.19k £67.65k £40.90k £30.35k £31.42k
Total expenditure £83.34k £63.91k £101.90k £50.15k £11.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A