Accounts and annual returns MONMOUTH DIOCESE MOTHERS UNION

Charity number: 1073782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 November 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 November 2017 28 days late Download Open in new window