Financial history MONMOUTH DIOCESE MOTHERS UNION

Charity number: 1073782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £32.64k £29.06k £25.18k £25.27k £9.00k
Total expenditure £30.67k £28.67k £26.08k £10.49k £20.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A