Financial history THE ROUNDHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1071487
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.40m £11.98m £12.99m £11.73m £8.12m
Total expenditure £12.53m £11.99m £12.20m £12.16m £7.68m
Income from government contracts £0 £13.21k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £974.71k £974.71k £974.71k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £707.00k £1.39m £1.06m £1.02m £1.67m
Income - Other trading activities £4.90m £5.04m £5.01m £5.32m £1.12m
Income - Charitable activities £6.79m £5.54m £6.77m £5.24m £5.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.48k £4.71k £148.70k £155.54k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £107.50k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.62m £8.33m £8.53m £8.42m £5.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.91m £3.67m £3.67m £3.74m £2.18m
Expenditure - Governance £79.85k £0 £77.89k £80.48k £161.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £36.67k £0 £36.79k £0 £34.12k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0