Financial history THE S. MARY AND S. ANNE ABBOTS BROMLEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1073252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.82k £855 £12.74k £300 £0
Total expenditure £550 £550 £550 £22.47k £7.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A