THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY LEEDS BRANCH

Charity number: 1072452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 20 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 25 July 2019 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 25 July 2019 55 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download