Financial history THE BORN FREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1070906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.95m £6.09m £5.31m £5.88m £6.14m
Total expenditure £6.00m £6.31m £6.21m £6.82m £5.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £110.15k N/A N/A £64.25k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.98m £5.67m £4.03m £5.30m £5.82m
Income - Other trading activities £763.44k £307.96k £396.69k £409.00k £173.24k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £786.72k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £109.82k £105.10k £76.04k £46.00k £88.23k
Income - Other £97.12k £3.49k £20.31k £117.00k £62.47k
Income - Legacies £1.73m £2.39m £1.86m £2.30m £2.58m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.10m £4.21m £4.61m £4.60m £3.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.90m £2.10m £1.60m £1.74m £1.45m
Expenditure - Governance £25.19k £49.62k £40.32k £69.00k £74.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £182.60k £1.45m £2.14m £1.06m £885.09k
Expenditure - Investment management £32.67k £27.92k £31.09k £23.00k £24.30k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £483.00k £0