BETH YOSEF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1071268
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 November 2020 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 06 November 2020 159 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 06 November 2020 525 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 06 November 2020 525 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 04 November 2020 888 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 04 November 2020 888 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 16 June 2017 On time Download