BETH YOSEF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1071268
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £40.78k £46.97k £46.77k £30.10k £0
Total expenditure £510.59k £110.14k £226.95k £5.51k £3.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A