ASPERGER EAST ANGLIA

Charity number: 1074699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £333.38k £318.42k £327.04k £336.99k £369.27k
Total expenditure £343.46k £295.63k £336.12k £361.13k £370.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £74.94k £74.94k £140.10k £51.81k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A