ASPERGER EAST ANGLIA

Charity number: 1074699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JERRY ELLIOTT Chair None on record
JULIE ELLIOTT Trustee 05 October 2020
THE NORFOLK COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION Received: On time
NORTH WALSHAM DISTRICT GUIDE ASSOCIATION Received: On time
MARCELLA OLIVE MBE Trustee None on record
Dr ELIZABETH KERSHAW BSCPGCEPHD Trustee None on record
NORMAN ANGUS Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR PETER LANGDON Trustee 03 February 2020 None on record
FIONA JANE HARE Trustee 10 August 2020 None on record
Rev Andrew Ronald Good Trustee 10 August 2020 None on record
JO WATTS Trustee 12 February 2013 None on record
Dr EKKEHART FA STAUFENBERG CONSULTANT Trustee None on record
MARY LAXTON Trustee 05 June 2017 None on record