Financial history AFRICAN ASSOCIATION OF LINGALA SPEAKERS

Charity number: 1099862
Charity reporting is overdue by 242 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £11 £0 £0 £1
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A