FLASH LEY C.P. SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1072053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.00k £7.41k £11.67k £29.24k £10.71k
Total expenditure £8.08k £7.10k £10.19k £24.04k £13.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A