ST JOHN'S COMMUNITY HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1073472
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 259 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 259 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 625 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 625 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 990 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 990 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1355 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1355 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1720 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1720 days