ST JOHN'S COMMUNITY HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1073472
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 02/07/2015
Total gross income £34.54k £31.33k £26.58k £23.61k £7.52k
Total expenditure £36.12k £36.07k £26.54k £25.89k £4.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A