Accounts and annual returns GALLOWS BANK MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1071018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required