Financial history GALLOWS BANK MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1071018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £212 £355 £100 £1.39k £810
Total expenditure £198 £575 £198 £2.53k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A