AFRICAN CARIBBEAN FORUM

Charity number: 1072021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £37.92k £39.21k £41.81k £28.52k £10.31k
Total expenditure £42.55k £35.74k £35.45k £30.88k £14.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.27k £10.00k