WADDINGTON ALL SAINTS P T A

Charity number: 1071694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.19k £5.36k £5.86k £6.84k £3.69k
Total expenditure £5.79k £5.57k £4.44k £5.62k £5.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A