SETPOINT LONDON EAST

Charity number: 1073086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £41.28k £35.16k £38.91k £62.38k £21.27k
Total expenditure £55.10k £51.74k £45.55k £52.43k £40.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £9.48k