CARDIFF AND VALE OF GLAMORGAN PARENTS FEDERATION (LEARNING DISABILITIES)

Charity number: 1076847
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £103.00k £112.15k £97.96k £112.29k £105.23k
Total expenditure £101.88k £99.00k £104.87k £86.71k £93.37k
Income from government contracts £53.43k £53.43k £53.43k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £53.13k £53.69k